CA SJR10 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to military health care.
Title
Military: health care.
Sponsors
Asm. Gilbert Cedillo [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Jeff Denham [R] | Sen. Abel Maldonado [R] |
Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Patricia Wiggins [D] | Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - SJR 10 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent Cal SJR10 Committee on V.A. (Denham) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-26 - Senate - Special Consent Cal SJR10 Committee on V.A. (Denham) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2009-09-10 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-09-09 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 3232.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-04 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) | |
2009-07-13 | To Com. on V.A. | |
2009-06-26 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-26 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1491.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-25 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-28 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |