CA SCR99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and Veteran Suicide Prevention Awareness Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Assembly - SCR 99 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR99 Roth et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 224, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6518.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2018-08-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-09SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5225.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-07SenateFrom inactive file.
2018-02-26SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Newman.
2018-02-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback