CA SCR97 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inflammatory Breast Cancer Awareness Day of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - Assembly - SCR 97 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR97 Leyva et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 79, Statutes of 2018.
2018-05-31SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2018-05-25SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5307.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 17).
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-03-15SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-02-14SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-07SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback