CA SCR97 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-20)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-20)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Asian Pacific American Mental Health Day.
Title
Asian Pacific American Mental Health Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Special Consent #28 SCR97 Yee (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR97 Yee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR97 Yee (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-07-06 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |
2010-06-28 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4098.) To enrollment. | |
2010-06-23 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-06-02 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Page 5468.) To Senate. | |
2010-05-28 | From Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-05-20 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee May 20). | |
2010-05-06 | To Com. on RULES. | |
2010-04-29 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2010-04-29 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3380.) To Assembly. | |
2010-04-07 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |