CA SCR96 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-23-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-23-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Eating Disorders Awareness Week.
Title
Eating Disorders Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR96 Dodd et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR96 Dodd et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 23, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4300.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 8). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4268.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |