CA SCR96 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-24)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-24)
Status: Passed on August 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Philippine Independence Day.
Title
Philippine Independence Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR96 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - SCR 96 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR96 Corbett (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - SCR 96 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR96 Corbett (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4618.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected August 23.) | |
2012-08-14 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-13 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5899.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-09 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5846.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | Action rescinded whereby the resolution was read, adopted, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-05 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-07-05 | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-06-27 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-27 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5482.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-21 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). | |
2012-06-11 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-07 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-06-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3790.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-06-04 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |