CA SCR95 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Olympic Games.
Title
International Olympic Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR95 Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR95 Gaines (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-03 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-06-28 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Read. Adopted. (Page 5528.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-21 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-15 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-06-15 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3940.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-31 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |