CA SCR91 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Law Revision Commission.
Title
California Law Revision Commission: studies.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Assembly - SCR 91 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR91 Roth et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR91 Roth et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6257.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4213.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4815.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |