CA SCR90 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Joseph Tavaglione Interchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joseph Tavaglione Interchange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR90 Roth et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-07-02SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-18SenateSet for hearing June 25.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5065.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2018-02-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-01-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback