CA SCR9 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Hmong History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hmong History Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-12 - Assembly - SCR 9 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR9 Pan (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-19SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
2017-09-13SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-12AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3226.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 8).
2017-09-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-09-01SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-08-28SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-24SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-24SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-01-17SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan.
2017-01-11SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-01-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback