CA SCR89 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-19)
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Deputy Sheriff Brian “Ish” Ishmael Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deputy Sheriff Brian “Ish” Ishmael Memorial Highway.

Sponsors

Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - SCR 89 Dahle Senate Third Reading By BIGELOW (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent SCR89 Dahle et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-11SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-11SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 74(d) suspended.
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2020-08-28SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-08-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-06SenateSet for hearing August 13.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1. Page 4076.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-07-27SenateSet for hearing August 4.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-06-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback