CA SCR88 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-26)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Black April Memorial Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Black April Memorial Month.

Sponsors

Sen. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR88 Nguyen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2018.
2018-05-04SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-05-01SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 4939.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16).
2018-04-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-04-05SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4541.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-22SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-03-22SenateFrom inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen.
2018-01-18SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback