CA SCR88 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-26-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-26-1)
Status: Passed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Human Trafficking Awareness Month.
Title
Human Trafficking Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR88 Runner Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR88 Runner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR88 Runner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2976.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Holden. Ordered to third reading. Read. Amended. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected January 27). |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 15). |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2276.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |