CA SCR88 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Arthritis Awareness Month.
Title
Arthritis Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-07 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR88 Alquist Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR88 Alquist (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR88 Alquist (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-11 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2012-06-07 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 3791.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-05-31 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5203.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). | |
2012-05-25 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-14 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-14 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 3490.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-30 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |