CA SCR86 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to veterans.
Title
Veterans of the Republic of Vietnam Armed Forces Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SCR 86 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR86 Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR86 Nguyen (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6110.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4660.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |