CA SCR85 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-16 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR85 Bradford (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-12AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-01-12SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback