CA SCR85 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Viet Dzung Human Rights Memorial Highway.
Title
Viet Dzung Human Rights Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-03 - Senate - Special Consent #18 SCR85 Correa (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SCR 85 Correa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR85 Correa (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SCR 85 Correa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SCR85 Correa (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4255.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3330.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3039.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |