CA SCR82 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Neonatal Nurses Day.
Title
Neonatal Nurses Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-12 - Assembly - SCR 82 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR82 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR82 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-19 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3226.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 8). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |