CA SCR8 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the President Barack H. Obama Highway.
Title
President Barack H. Obama Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR8 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SCR 8 Portantino Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR8 Portantino et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SCR 8 Portantino Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR8 Portantino et al (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 147, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2466.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 5. Page 2839.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2017-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1070.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-12-20 | Senate | (Corrected January 5). |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |