CA SCR79 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Girls and Women in Sports Day.
Title
California Girls and Women in Sports Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Assembly - SCR 79 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR79 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR79 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 55. Noes 0. Page 4046.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 6). |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3186.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |