CA SCR78 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-13-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-13-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to The Convention on the Elimination of All Forms of Discrimination Against Women.
Title
The Convention on the Elimination of All Forms of Discrimination Against Women.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR78 Jackson et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR78 Jackson et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4065.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 13). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2284.) (August 29). |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 29. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |