CA SCR77 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Representative Ellen O’Kane Tauscher Memorial Bore.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Representative Ellen O’Kane Tauscher Memorial Bore.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR77 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2020-06-11SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-06-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3623.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-27SenateSet for hearing May 29.
2020-01-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2020-01-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-09-10SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback