CA SCR75 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Archives Month.
Title
Archival institutions: California Archives Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SCR 75 Allen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SCR75 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SCR75 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3427.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2481.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |