CA SCR75 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Viral Hepatitis Awareness Month.
Title
Viral Hepatitis Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - Assembly - SCR 75 Blakeslee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR75 Blakeslee (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR75 Blakeslee (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-21 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. | |
2012-06-14 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-14 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5306.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-07 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 7). | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3403.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-02 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |