CA SCR73 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Blue Light Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blue Light Awareness Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - SCR 73 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR73 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 158, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3209.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 5).
2019-09-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-08-30SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2329.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-28SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-21Senate(Corrected August 29).
2019-08-21SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback