CA SCR72 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Valley Fever Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Valley Fever Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - SCR 72 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR72 Fuller et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-14SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-14SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
2017-09-08SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-07AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3050.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-05AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 5).
2017-09-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-08-28SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2247.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-08-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-20SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback