CA SCR68 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-24-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-24-1)
Status: Passed on August 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to 2015 California Invasive Species Action Week.
Title
California Invasive Species Action Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SCR68 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR68 Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR68 Galgiani (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-26 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-08-26 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2174.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1351.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |