CA SCR67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Jack Williams Memorial Highway.
Title
Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Jack Williams Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Assembly - SCR 67 Archuleta Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Special Consent SCR67 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Special Consent SCR67 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4603.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3154.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3088.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |