CA SCR66 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Bebe Moore Campbell National Minority Mental Health Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bebe Moore Campbell National Minority Mental Health Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Assembly - SCR 66 Mitchell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR66 Mitchell et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-28SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-28SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2017-07-20SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2017-07-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-07-03SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1846.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-06-28SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-22SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback