CA SCR66 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Online Voter Registration Day.
Title
Online Voter Registration Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - SCR 66 Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR66 Yee (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR66 Yee (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-12 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3149.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 6). |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1975.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |