CA SCR64 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to drug abuse.
Title
Drug abuse awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - SCR 64 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR64 Bates et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR64 Bates et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 2911.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2198.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |