CA SCR63 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-06 - July 11 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-06 - July 11 hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Vicente Fernández Highway.
Title
The Vicente Fernández Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-06 | Senate | July 11 hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Set for hearing July 11. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SCR63 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SCR63 |