CA SCR62 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Portugal Day.
Title
Portugal Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR62 Mendoza Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - SCR 62 Mendoza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR62 Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - SCR 62 Mendoza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR62 Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1541.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2039.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1117.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |