CA SCR61 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public health.
Title
Prostate Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SCR61 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SCR 61 Dahle Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR61 Dahle (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SCR 61 Dahle Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR61 Dahle (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5340.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5757.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2452.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |