CA SCR61 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to veterans.
Title
Veterans of the Republic of Vietnam Armed Forces Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - SCR 61 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR61 Nguyen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR61 Nguyen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-05 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2406.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1570.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |