CA SCR6 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-23-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Republic of Vietnam Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Republic of Vietnam Month.

Sponsors

Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]
Sen. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR6 Nguyen et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 3411.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-09-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-09-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11).
2017-09-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-09-05SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2468.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-29SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-29SenateRead third time and amended.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom inactive file on motion of Senator Nguyen.
2017-02-02SenateOrdered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen.
2017-02-01SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2016-12-19SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback