CA SCR6 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression
Action: 2009-03-02 - In Assembly. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Prefecture of Athens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prefecture of Athens: sister state relationship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR6 Alquist (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-02 In Assembly. Held at Desk.
2009-03-02 Read and adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 240.) To Assembly.
2009-02-26 Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading.
2009-02-14 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2008-12-17 Introduced. To Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback