CA SCR57 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Runaway and Homeless Youth Prevention Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Runaway and Homeless Youth Prevention Month.

Sponsors

Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Mia Bonta [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - SCR 57 Hurtado Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR57 Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-08SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-07AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2855.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-09-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 2).
2021-09-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-09-01SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2307.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-08-25SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-18SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback