CA SCR54 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Mental Health Awareness Month.
Title
National Mental Health Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - SCR 54 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR54 Beall et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR54 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR54 Beall et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR54 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2317.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |