CA SCR54 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Disneyland.
Title
Sixtieth anniversary of Disneyland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - SCR 54 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR54 Nguyen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR54 Nguyen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2150.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |