CA SCR53 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Military Appreciation Month.
Title
National Military Appreciation Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - SCR 53 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR53 Fuller et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR53 Fuller et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR53 Fuller et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR53 Fuller et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-14 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2017-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3050.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1255.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |