CA SCR51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Title
Day of the Teacher.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR51 Mendoza et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1025.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |