CA SCR51 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-27 - To Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-27 - To Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to earthquakes.
Title
Earthquake preparedness: the Great California ShakeOut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR51 Corbett (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-27 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2009-08-25 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-08-24 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1914.) To Assembly. | |
2009-08-20 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |