CA SCR49 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Wildfire Awareness Week.
Title
Wildfire Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SCR49 Berryhill (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - SCR 49 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR49 Berryhill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - SCR 49 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR49 Berryhill (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1549.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1974.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 950.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |