CA SCR48 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to criminal sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-14 - Assembly - SCR 48 Skinner Senate Third Reading By LOW (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR48 Skinner et al (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-22SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 175, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-22SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2017-09-15SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-09-14AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 3429.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11).
2017-07-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2017-06-29SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 1802.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1519.) (June 13).
2017-05-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-27SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback