CA SCR45 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-15-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Elder and Dependent Adult Abuse Awareness Month.
Title
Elder and Dependent Adult Abuse Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Assembly - SCR 45 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR45 Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR45 Dodd (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-20 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2375.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1434.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |