CA SCR43 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sexual assault.
Title
Sexual Assault Awareness Month: Denim Day California.
Sponsors
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] |
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Young Kim [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Assembly - SCR 43 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR43 Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR43 Galgiani (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1818.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |