CA SCR43 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Water Awareness Month.
Title
California Water Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SCR43 Huff (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-02 - Assembly - SCR 43 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR43 Huff (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-02 - Assembly - SCR 43 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR43 Huff (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-07-20 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |
2009-07-16 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1766.) To enrollment. | |
2009-07-09 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-02 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-07-02 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2362.) To Senate. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-05-26 | To Com. on RULES. | |
2009-05-14 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 899.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-06 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |