CA SCR42 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Voter Awareness Week.
Title
Voter Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Asm. Young Kim [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR42 Huff Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - SCR 42 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR42 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - SCR 42 Huff Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR42 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1637.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 22). |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected May 20). |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 835.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |