CA SCR41 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.
Title
California Holocaust Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - SCR 41 Allen Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR41 Allen et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR41 Allen et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1948.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 854.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |